Treasury
Organization
Found in 5 Collections and/or Records:
File
Official: Treasury: correspondence., 08 Jan 1925 - 26 Jun 1925
File
Reference Code: GBR/0014/CHAR 18/8
Scope and Contents
Correspondents include: Major-General Sir Fabian Ware (2); 1st Lord Cecil of Chelwood [earlier Lord Robert Cecil, Chancellor of the Duchy of Lancaster] on European disarmament (2); Lord Eustace Percy [President of the Board of Education]; Leo Amery [Secretary of State for the Colonies] on colonial trade matters (4); Frederick Leith-Ross [British representative on Finance Board] of the Reparation Commission; J Coudurier de Chassaigne (2); 1st Lord Midleton; Wilfrid Ashley [later 1st Lord...
Dates:
08 Jan 1925 - 26 Jun 1925
Conditions Governing Access:
Open
File
Official: Treasury: correspondence., 01 Jul 1925 - 28 Dec 1925
File
Reference Code: GBR/0014/CHAR 18/9
Scope and Contents
Correspondents include: Herbert Morrison, Secretary of the London Labour Party, on unemployment; 1st Lord Cecil of Chelwood [earlier Lord Robert Cecil, Chancellor of the Duchy of Lancaster] on disarmament; Wilfrid Ashley [later 1st Lord Mount Temple, Minister of Transport]; 1st Lord Weir (3) including one on industrial relief; Sir Maurice Hankey [Secretary to the Cabinet]; Francis Curzon [later 5th Lord Howe] on naval officers' marriage allowance; Stanley Baldwin [Prime Minister] (2)...
Dates:
01 Jul 1925 - 28 Dec 1925
Conditions Governing Access:
Open
File
Official: Treasury: correspondence from WSC (carbon copies)., 09 Nov 1924 - 30 Dec 1924
File
Reference Code: GBR/0014/CHAR 18/2
Scope and Contents
Recipients include: Stanley Baldwin [Prime Minister] (5); Leo Amery, Secretary of State for the Colonies, (6) on subjects including expenditure on Iraq and Palestine; 1st Lord Birkenhead [earlier F E Smith, Secretary of State for India]; Sir Laming Worthington-Evans [Secretary of State for War]; Ronald McNeill [later 1st Lord Cushendun, Parliamentary Under-Secretary of State for Foreign Affairs]; William Bridgeman, First Lord of the Admiralty, (4) on subjects including marriage licenses for...
Dates:
09 Nov 1924 - 30 Dec 1924
Conditions Governing Access:
Open
File
Official: Treasury: correspondence mainly from WSC (carbon copies)., 10 Jan 1926 - 21 Dec 1926
File
Reference Code: GBR/0014/CHAR 18/29
Scope and Contents
Recipients include: President of the Board of Trade, Sir Philip Cunliffe-Lister [earlier Sir Philip Lloyd-Greame, later 1st Lord Swinton] (3); F Stanley Jackson [Chairman of the Conservative and Unionist Party]; Count Guiseppe Volpi [Italian Minister of Finance] (2); Wilfrid Ashley [later 1st Lord Mount Temple, Minister of Transport] (2); Sir Robert Horne [later 1st Lord Slamannan]; Leo Amery [Secretary of State for the Colonies] (4); Sir James Craig [later 1st Lord Craigavon, Prime Minister...
Dates:
10 Jan 1926 - 21 Dec 1926
Conditions Governing Access:
Open
File
Official: Treasury: WSC's minutes., 16 Nov 1924 - 24 Dec 1924
File
Reference Code: GBR/0014/CHAR 18/3
Scope and Contents
Includes carbon copies of minutes and letters from WSC to various individuals, mainly Treasury officials, including: Sir Warren Fisher [Permanent Secretary]; Sir George Barstow [Controller of Supply Services]; Prime Minister [Stanley Baldwin]; Walter Guinness [later 1st Lord Moyne, Financial Secretary]; Sir Russell Scott [Controller]; Sir Otto Niemeyer [Controller of Finance]; Sir Horace Hamilton [Chairman, Board of Customs and Excise]; James Grigg [Principal Private Secretary to the...
Dates:
16 Nov 1924 - 24 Dec 1924
Conditions Governing Access:
Open
Filtered By
Additional filters:
- Subject
- Free trade 3
- Coal mining 2
- Unemployment 2
- Agriculture 1
- Air warfare 1
- Armed forces 1
- Egypt 1
- France 1
- Labour relations 1
- Military equipment 1
- Press 1
- Roads 1
- Scotland 1
- Soviet Union 1
- Strikes 1
- Trade unions 1
- Transport 1 + ∧ less
∨ more